ID S1074 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Signed by Governor on 03/26/15 Session Law Chapter 124 Effective: 03/26/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Signed by Governor on 03/26/15 Session Law Chapter 124 Effective: 03/26/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
IDAHO HONEY COMMISSION - Amends, repeals and adds to existing law to revise the name of the commission and to provide for membership on the commission.
Title
Amends, repeals and adds to existing law to revise the name of the commission and to provide for membership on the commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 03/26/15 Session Law Chapter 124 Effective: 03/26/2015 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Reported delivered to Governor on 03/23/15 |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2015-03-20 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2015-03-17 | House | to Senate |
2015-03-17 | House | Title apvd |
2015-03-17 | House | PASSED -- 69-0-1 |
2015-03-17 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2015-03-16 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2015-03-13 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2015-03-03 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Agricultural Affairs |
2015-03-03 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2015-03-02 | Senate | to House |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Title apvd |
2015-03-02 | Senate | PASSED -- 34-0-0 |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Agricultural Affairs |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |