ID S1073 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Session Law Chapter 256 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

UNDERGROUND FACILITIES DAMAGE PREVENTION -- Amends existing law to define terms and to provide for who shall and shall not locate and mark service laterals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to define terms and to provide for who shall and shall not locate and mark service laterals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28SenateSession Law Chapter 256 Effective: 07/01/2019
2019-03-28SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2019-03-27HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2019-03-26SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2019-03-26SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2019-03-25Houseto Senate
2019-03-25HouseTitle apvd
2019-03-25HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 63-0-7
2019-03-22HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-21HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-03-13HouseRead First Time, Referred to Environment, Energy & Technology
2019-03-13HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2019-03-12Senateto House
2019-03-12SenateTitle apvd
2019-03-12SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 26-0-9
2019-03-08SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-03-07SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-02-26SenateReferred to Commerce & Human Resources
2019-02-21SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-02-20SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-02-11SenateReported Printed; referred to Commerce & Human Resources
2019-02-08SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback