ID S1073 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Session Law Chapter 256 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Session Law Chapter 256 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
UNDERGROUND FACILITIES DAMAGE PREVENTION -- Amends existing law to define terms and to provide for who shall and shall not locate and mark service laterals.
Title
Amends existing law to define terms and to provide for who shall and shall not locate and mark service laterals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 256 Effective: 07/01/2019 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2019-03-27 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2019-03-25 | House | to Senate |
2019-03-25 | House | Title apvd |
2019-03-25 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 63-0-7 |
2019-03-22 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2019-03-21 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2019-03-13 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Environment, Energy & Technology |
2019-03-13 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2019-03-12 | Senate | to House |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Title apvd |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 26-0-9 |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Commerce & Human Resources |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Commerce & Human Resources |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |