ID S1072 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-03 - Signed by Governor on 04/03/15 Session Law Chapter 248 Effective: 07/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-03 - Signed by Governor on 04/03/15 Session Law Chapter 248 Effective: 07/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
ELECTIONS - SCHOOL DISTRICT TRUSTEES - Amends existing law to provide that certain code sections shall apply to all elections of school district trustees, except for election of trustees in a school district that has fewer than 500 students.
Title
Amends existing law to provide that certain code sections shall apply to all elections of school district trustees, except for election of trustees in a school district that has fewer than 500 students.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-03 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 04/03/15 Session Law Chapter 248 Effective: 07/01/2015 |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Reported delivered to Governor on 03/30/15 |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2015-03-27 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2015-03-24 | House | to Senate |
2015-03-24 | House | Title apvd |
2015-03-24 | House | PASSED -- 50-19-1 |
2015-03-24 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2015-03-23 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2015-03-20 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2015-03-13 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Education |
2015-03-13 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2015-03-12 | Senate | to House |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Title apvd |
2015-03-12 | Senate | PASSED -- 24-11-0 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Read third time in full as amended |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Read second time as amended, filed for Third reading |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Read first time as amended, filed for Second Reading |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Reported out without recommendation, as amended |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2015-03-05 | Senate | 03/05 Read third time in full |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Education |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |