ID S1070 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-19 - Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-19 - Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
ELECTIONS -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding absentee ballots.
Title
Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding absentee ballots.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-19 | House | Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs |
2021-02-19 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2021-02-18 | Senate | to House |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Title apvd |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to State Affairs |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |