ID S1070 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-28 - Read First Time, Referred to Commerce & Human Resources
Pending: House Commerce and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-28 - Read First Time, Referred to Commerce & Human Resources
Pending: House Commerce and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
PUBLIC EMPLOYEE RETIREMENT SYSTEM -- Amends existing law to allow a member receiving disability retirement benefits to volunteer or work under certain conditions.
Title
Amends existing law to allow a member receiving disability retirement benefits to volunteer or work under certain conditions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Commerce & Human Resources |
2019-02-28 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2019-02-27 | Senate | to House |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Title apvd |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Read third time in full as amended -- PASSED 34-0-1 |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read second time as amended, filed for Third reading |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Read first time as amended, filed for Second Reading |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Reported out without recommendation, as amended |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Commerce & Human Resources |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |