ID S1069 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Session Law Chapter 153 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Session Law Chapter 153 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
INSURANCE -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding contracts with providers of dental services.
Title
Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding contracts with providers of dental services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 153 Effective: 07/01/2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2019-03-19 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2019-03-15 | House | to Senate |
2019-03-15 | House | Title apvd |
2019-03-15 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 64-0-6 |
2019-03-14 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2019-03-13 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to Health & Welfare |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported out of Committee, Returned to the Desk for re-referral |
2019-02-28 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Business |
2019-02-28 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2019-02-27 | Senate | to House |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Title apvd |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1 |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Commerce & Human Resources |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |