ID S1066 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-09 - Signed by Governor on 04/09/15 Session Law Chapter 292 Effective: 07/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

PRIMARY ELECTIONS - Amends and adds to existing law to establish a presidential primary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends and adds to existing law to establish a presidential primary.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-31 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-09SenateSigned by Governor on 04/09/15 Session Law Chapter 292 Effective: 07/01/2015
2015-04-07SenateReported delivered to Governor on 04/07/15
2015-04-06SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2015-04-02HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2015-04-01SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2015-03-31SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2015-03-31Houseto Senate
2015-03-31HouseTitle apvd
2015-03-31HousePASSED -- 50-19-1
2015-03-31HouseMotion to send to Gen Ord, motion failed
2015-03-31HouseRead Third Time in Full
2015-03-30HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2015-03-27HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 30, 2015
2015-03-26HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2015-03-25HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2015-03-12HouseBill Previously Held at Desk, Referred to State Affairs
2015-03-04HouseRead First Time, Held at Desk
2015-03-04HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2015-03-03Senateto House
2015-03-03SenateTitle apvd
2015-03-03SenatePASSED -- 23-11-0
2015-03-03SenateRead third time in full
2015-03-02SenateRetained on calendar
2015-02-26SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2015-02-25SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2015-02-13SenateReported Printed; referred to State Affairs
2015-02-12SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback