ID S1065 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Session Law Chapter 307 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

TRANSPORTATION -- Adds to and amends existing law to provide for the issuance of certain bonds and to establish the Transportation Expansion and Congestion Mitigation Program Capital Project Fund and the Transportation Expansion and Congestion Mitigation Program Debt Service Fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to and amends existing law to provide for the issuance of certain bonds and to establish the Transportation Expansion and Congestion Mitigation Program Capital Project Fund and the Transportation Expansion and Congestion Mitigation Program Debt Service Fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04SenateSession Law Chapter 307 Effective: 07/01/2019
2019-04-04SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2019-04-03HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2019-04-03SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2019-04-02SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2019-04-02Houseto Senate
2019-04-02HouseTitle apvd
2019-04-02HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 37-32-1
2019-04-01HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-29HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, April 1, 2019
2019-03-28HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-27HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-02-27HouseRead First Time, Referred to Transportation & Defense
2019-02-27HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2019-02-26Senateto House
2019-02-26SenateTitle apvd
2019-02-26SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 20-15-0
2019-02-21SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-02-20SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-02-11SenateReported Printed; referred to Transportation
2019-02-08SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback