ID S1065 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-01 - Signed by Governor on 04/01/13 Session Law Chapter 210 Effective: 07/01/13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-01 - Signed by Governor on 04/01/13 Session Law Chapter 210 Effective: 07/01/13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law to include citizens band (CB) radio and amateur radio towers in structures exempt from standards for guyed towers.
Title
Amends existing law to include citizens band (CB) radio and amateur radio towers in structures exempt from standards for guyed towers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 04/01/13 Session Law Chapter 210 Effective: 07/01/13 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Reported delivered to Governor on 03/27/13 |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2013-03-27 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2013-03-25 | House | to Senate |
2013-03-25 | House | Title apvd |
2013-03-25 | House | PASSED -- 62-3-5 |
2013-03-25 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2013-03-22 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2013-03-21 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2013-02-26 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Transportation & Defense |
2013-02-26 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2013-02-25 | Senate | to House |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Title apvd |
2013-02-25 | Senate | PASSED -- 34-0-1 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Transportation |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |