ID S1064 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Filed in Office of the Secretary of Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

MOTOR VEHICLES -- Repeals and adds to existing law to prohibit persons from operating a motor vehicle while using a mobile electronic device.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeals and adds to existing law to prohibit persons from operating a motor vehicle while using a mobile electronic device.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-19SenateFiled in Office of the Secretary of Senate
2019-02-19SenateRead third time in full -- FAILED 15-18-2
2019-02-14SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-02-13SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-02-11SenateReported Printed; referred to Transportation
2019-02-08SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback