ID S1062 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-01 - Session Law Chapter 50 Effective: 03/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-01 - Session Law Chapter 50 Effective: 03/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS -- MILITARY DIVISION -- Appropriates an additional $4,400,000 to the Federal/State Agreements Program for construction and maintenance projects for fiscal year 2017.
Title
Appropriates an additional $4,400,000 to the Federal/State Agreements Program for construction and maintenance projects for fiscal year 2017.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-01 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 50 Effective: 03/01/2017 |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2017-02-27 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2017-02-22 | House | to Senate |
2017-02-22 | House | Title apvd |
2017-02-22 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 67-0-3 |
2017-02-21 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2017-02-20 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2017-02-17 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-02-16 | House | Read First Time, Filed for Second Reading |
2017-02-16 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2017-02-15 | Senate | to House |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1 |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Finance |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |