ID S1061 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

EDUCATION -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding school levies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding school levies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04SenateReferred to Education
2019-04-04SenateRead first time as amended in the House, filed for Second Reading
2019-04-04SenateReported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended
2019-04-03SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; referred to engrossment
2019-04-03SenateReferred to 10th Order for possible concurrence
2019-04-03SenateReturned from House, amended
2019-04-02Houseto Senate
2019-04-02HouseTitle apvd
2019-04-02HouseRules Suspended:
2019-04-02HouseRead second time as amended in House; Filed for Third Reading
2019-04-01HouseRead first time as amended in House; Filed for Second Reading
2019-04-01HouseFiled for First Reading
2019-04-01HouseAmendments Referred to the JRA for Printing
2019-04-01HouseReported out without recommendation as amended
2019-04-01HouseReferred to the Committee of the Whole
2019-03-28HouseU.C. to be placed on General Orders
2019-03-27HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-26HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-26HouseU.C. to place at bottom of third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-25HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-22HouseU.C. to place at bottom of Senate bills of third reading calendar Monday, March 25, 2019
2019-03-21HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-20HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-19HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-03-13HouseRead First Time, Referred to Education
2019-03-13HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2019-03-12Senateto House
2019-03-12SenateTitle apvd
2019-03-12SenateRead third time in full as amended -- PASSED 30-3-2
2019-03-08SenateRead second time as amended, filed for Third reading
2019-03-07SenateRead first time as amended, filed for Second Reading
2019-03-07SenateReported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended
2019-03-07SenateAmendments reported printed
2019-03-07SenateAmendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment
2019-03-07SenateReported out without recommendation, as amended
2019-03-07SenatePlaced in the Committee of the Whole
2019-02-28SenateReported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment
2019-02-08SenateReported Printed; referred to Education
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback