ID S1060 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-19 - Session Law Chapter 90 Effective: 03/19/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-19 - Session Law Chapter 90 Effective: 03/19/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PUBLIC HEALTH DISTRICTS -- Amends existing law to provide for the approval or extension of orders applicable to all persons in a county or public health district and to provide for an infraction.
Title
Amends existing law to provide for the approval or extension of orders applicable to all persons in a county or public health district and to provide for an infraction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-19 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 90 Effective: 03/19/2021 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2021-03-16 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2021-03-12 | House | to Senate |
2021-03-12 | House | Title apvd |
2021-03-12 | House | Previously Read in Full -- PASSED 66-2-2 |
2021-03-12 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2021-03-11 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-03-10 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-03-09 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-03-05 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 8, 2021 |
2021-03-04 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-03-03 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-03-02 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-03-01 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-02-26 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 1, 2021 |
2021-02-25 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-02-24 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-02-24 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2021-02-23 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2021-02-18 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Health & Welfare |
2021-02-18 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2021-02-17 | Senate | to House |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Title apvd |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 32-1-2 |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Health & Welfare |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |