ID S1060 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Session Law Chapter 297 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

EDUCATION -- Adds to existing law to provide flexible schedules and early graduation opportunities for college and career ready students.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to existing law to provide flexible schedules and early graduation opportunities for college and career ready students.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04SenateSession Law Chapter 297 Effective: 07/01/2019
2019-04-02SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2019-04-01HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2019-03-29SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2019-03-28Senateto enrol
2019-03-28SenateTitle apvd
2019-03-28SenateRead third time as amended in the House -- PASSED 35-0-0
2019-03-27SenateRead second time as amended in the House, filed for Third Reading
2019-03-26SenateRead first time as amended in the House, filed for Second Reading
2019-03-26SenateReported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended
2019-03-26SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; referred to engrossment
2019-03-26SenateReferred to 10th Order for possible concurrence
2019-03-26SenateReturned from House, amended
2019-03-25Houseto Senate
2019-03-25HouseTitle apvd
2019-03-25HouseRules Suspended:
2019-03-25HouseRead second time as amended in House; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-22HouseRead first time as amended in House; Filed for Second Reading
2019-03-21HouseFiled for First Reading
2019-03-21HouseAmendments Referred to the JRA for Printing
2019-03-21HouseReported out without recommendation as amended
2019-03-21HouseReferred to the Committee of the Whole
2019-03-18HouseU.C. to be placed on General Orders
2019-03-15HouseReported out without amendments; filed for second reading
2019-03-11HouseReported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders
2019-02-28HouseRead First Time, Referred to Education
2019-02-28HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2019-02-27Senateto House
2019-02-27SenateTitle apvd
2019-02-27SenateRead third time in full as amended -- PASSED 34-0-1
2019-02-25SenateRead second time as amended, filed for Third reading
2019-02-22SenateRead first time as amended, filed for Second Reading
2019-02-22SenateReported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended
2019-02-22SenateAmendments reported printed
2019-02-21SenateAmendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment
2019-02-21SenateReported out without recommendation, as amended
2019-02-21SenatePlaced in the Committee of the Whole
2019-02-15SenateReported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment
2019-02-08SenateReported Printed; referred to Education
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback