ID S1058 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-08 - Filed in Office of the Secretary of Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-08 - Filed in Office of the Secretary of Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
TELEHEALTH ACCESS -- Adds to existing law to provide for coverage for the cost of telehealth services.
Title
Adds to existing law to provide for coverage for the cost of telehealth services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 10 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-08 | Senate | Filed in Office of the Secretary of Senate |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Read third time in full as amended -- FAILED 10-24-1 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Read second time as amended, filed for Third reading |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Read first time as amended, filed for Second Reading |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Reported out without recommendation, as amended |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Commerce & Human Resources |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |