ID S1057 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Session Law Chapter 265 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

EDUCATION -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding continuous improvement plans for school districts and public charter schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding continuous improvement plans for school districts and public charter schools.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-02SenateSession Law Chapter 265 Effective: 07/01/2019
2019-04-02SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2019-04-01HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2019-03-29SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2019-03-28Senateto enrol
2019-03-28SenateTitle apvd
2019-03-28SenateRead third time as amended in the House -- PASSED 34-0-1
2019-03-27SenateRead second time as amended in the House, filed for Third Reading
2019-03-26SenateRead first time as amended in the House, filed for Second Reading
2019-03-26SenateReported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended
2019-03-26SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; referred to engrossment
2019-03-26SenateReferred to 10th Order for possible concurrence
2019-03-26SenateReturned from House, amended
2019-03-25Houseto Senate
2019-03-25HouseTitle apvd
2019-03-25HouseRules Suspended:
2019-03-25HouseRead second time as amended in House; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-22HouseRead first time as amended in House; Filed for Second Reading
2019-03-21HouseFiled for First Reading
2019-03-21HouseAmendments Referred to the JRA for Printing
2019-03-21HouseReported out without recommendation as amended
2019-03-21HouseReferred to the Committee of the Whole
2019-03-15HouseReported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders
2019-02-26HouseRead First Time, Referred to Education
2019-02-26HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2019-02-25Senateto House
2019-02-25SenateTitle apvd
2019-02-25SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0
2019-02-20SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-02-19SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-02-08SenateReported Printed; referred to Education
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback