ID S1055 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-19 - Session Law Chapter 110 Effective: 03/19/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

SPORT SHOOTING RANGES -- Amends existing law to revise the definition of “sport shooting range” and to define “expanding” and “increasing.”

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to revise the definition of “sport shooting range” and to define “expanding” and “increasing.”

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-19SenateSession Law Chapter 110 Effective: 03/19/2021
2021-03-16SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2021-03-16HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2021-03-15SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2021-03-15SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2021-03-12Houseto Senate
2021-03-12HouseTitle apvd
2021-03-12HousePreviously Read in Full -- PASSED 69-0-1
2021-03-12HouseRead Third Time in Full
2021-03-11HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2021-03-10HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2021-03-09HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2021-03-05HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 8, 2021
2021-03-04HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2021-03-03HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2021-03-02HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2021-03-01HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2021-02-26HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 1, 2021
2021-02-25HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2021-02-24HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2021-02-23HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2021-02-22HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2021-02-17HouseRead First Time, Referred to State Affairs
2021-02-17HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2021-02-16Senateto House
2021-02-16SenateTitle apvd
2021-02-16SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 33-1-1
2021-02-11SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2021-02-10SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2021-02-04SenateReported Printed; referred to State Affairs
2021-02-03SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback