ID S1055 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

MARRIAGE -- Repeals existing law regarding an educational pamphlet on AIDS.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeals existing law regarding an educational pamphlet on AIDS.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2019-03-18SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2019-03-15Houseto Senate
2019-03-15HouseTitle apvd
2019-03-15HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 65-0-5
2019-03-14HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-13HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-02-22HouseRead First Time, Referred to Health & Welfare
2019-02-22HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2019-02-21Senateto House
2019-02-21SenateTitle apvd
2019-02-21SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1
2019-02-18SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-02-15SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-02-07SenateReported Printed; referred to Health & Welfare
2019-02-06SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback