ID S1053 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-03 - Signed by Governor on 04/03/15 Session Law Chapter 246 Effective: 07/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

PROTECTION OF PERSONS UNDER DISABILITY AND THEIR PROPERTY - Amends existing law to revise provisions concerning the rights and powers of guardians ad litem.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to revise provisions concerning the rights and powers of guardians ad litem.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-03SenateSigned by Governor on 04/03/15 Session Law Chapter 246 Effective: 07/01/2015
2015-03-30SenateReported delivered to Governor on 03/30/15
2015-03-30SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2015-03-27HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2015-03-26SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2015-03-25SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2015-03-24Houseto Senate
2015-03-24HouseTitle apvd
2015-03-24HousePASSED -- 68-0-2
2015-03-24HouseRead Third Time in Full
2015-03-23HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2015-03-20HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2015-03-18HouseRead First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules, & Administration
2015-03-18HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2015-03-17Senateto House
2015-03-17SenateTitle apvd
2015-03-17SenatePASSED -- 34-0-1
2015-03-17SenateRead third time in full as amended
2015-03-16SenateRetained on calendar
2015-03-13SenateRead second time as amended, filed for Third reading
2015-03-12SenateRead first time as amended, filed for Second Reading
2015-03-12SenateReported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended
2015-03-12SenateAmendments reported printed
2015-03-12SenateAmendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment
2015-03-12SenateReported out without recommendation, as amended
2015-03-12SenatePlaced in the Committee of the Whole
2015-02-24SenateReported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment
2015-02-10SenateReported Printed; referred to Judiciary & Rules
2015-02-09SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback