ID S1053 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-24 - to Gen Ord
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amends existing law relating to property taxation to provide for specified certification relating to certain land actively devoted to agriculture.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law relating to property taxation to provide for specified certification relating to certain land actively devoted to agriculture.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2011-02-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-02-24 to Gen Ord
2011-02-24 Rpt out
2011-02-21 to Rev/Tax
2011-02-21 1st rdg
2011-02-21 House intro
2011-02-18 to House
2011-02-18 Title apvd
2011-02-18 3rd rdg as amen -- PASSED -- 26-8-1
2011-02-17 to 3rd rdg as amen
2011-02-17 2nd rdg
2011-02-16 to 2nd rdg as amen
2011-02-16 1st rdg
2011-02-16 Rpt engros
2011-02-15 to engros
2011-02-15 Rpt out amen
2011-02-02 to 14th Ord
2011-02-02 Rpt out
2011-01-28 to Loc Gov
2011-01-28 Rpt prt
2011-01-27 to printing
2011-01-27 1st rdg
2011-01-27 Senate intro

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback