ID S1046 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Session Law Chapter 59 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

HIGHWAY DISTRICTS -- Amends existing law to raise the dollar value of property that may be sold or disposed of.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to raise the dollar value of property that may be sold or disposed of.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07SenateSession Law Chapter 59 Effective: 07/01/2019
2019-03-07SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2019-03-06HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2019-03-05SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2019-03-04SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2019-03-01Houseto Senate
2019-03-01HouseTitle apvd
2019-03-01HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 64-0-6
2019-02-28HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-02-27HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-02-12HouseRead First Time, Referred to Transportation & Defense
2019-02-12HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2019-02-11Senateto House
2019-02-11SenateTitle apvd
2019-02-11SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 33-0-2
2019-02-07SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-02-06SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-02-04SenateReported Printed; referred to Transportation
2019-02-01SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback