ID S1046 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-24 - Recommitted to Commerce & Human Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-24 - Recommitted to Commerce & Human Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
HEALTH SAVINGS ACCOUNTS -- Amends existing law to provide that a high deductible health plan shall be made available to state employees on an optional basis and to provide that the Department of Administration shall make an annual deposit of a certain amount in a health savings account.
Title
Amends existing law to provide that a high deductible health plan shall be made available to state employees on an optional basis and to provide that the Department of Administration shall make an annual deposit of a certain amount in a health savings account.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | Senate | Recommitted to Commerce & Human Resources |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2017-03-17 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2017-03-15 | House | to Senate |
2017-03-15 | House | Title apvd |
2017-03-15 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 45-25-0 |
2017-03-14 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2017-03-13 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-10 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2017-03-06 | House | Referred to Commerce & Human Resources |
2017-03-06 | House | Reported out of Committee, Returned to the Desk for re-referral |
2017-02-28 | House | Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs |
2017-02-28 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2017-02-27 | Senate | to House |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Commerce & Human Resources |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |