ID S1045 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Read First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration
Pending: House Judiciary, Rules and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

CORRECTIONAL INDUSTRIES -- Amends existing law to provide for inmate trainee participation in Idaho Correctional Industries Training Programs; to provide for stipends; and to provide for contracts for agricultural training programs for inmate trainees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to provide for inmate trainee participation in Idaho Correctional Industries Training Programs; to provide for stipends; and to provide for contracts for agricultural training programs for inmate trainees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-21HouseRead First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration
2019-02-21HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2019-02-20Senateto House
2019-02-20SenateTitle apvd
2019-02-20SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0
2019-02-15SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-02-14SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-02-01SenateReported Printed; referred to Judiciary & Rules
2019-01-31SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback