ID S1041 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Session Law Chapter 33 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

GROUND WATER DISTRICTS -- Amends existing law to provide for emergency assessments, to provide for mitigation by a district due to noncompliance of a member and for the levy of special assessments, and to provide a procedure associated with certain district assessments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to provide for emergency assessments, to provide for mitigation by a district due to noncompliance of a member and for the levy of special assessments, and to provide a procedure associated with certain district assessments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26SenateSession Law Chapter 33 Effective: 07/01/2019
2019-02-25SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2019-02-22HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2019-02-21SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2019-02-20SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2019-02-19Houseto Senate
2019-02-19HouseTitle apvd
2019-02-19HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 69-0-1
2019-02-18HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-02-15HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-02-14HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-02-08HouseRead First Time, Referred to Resources & Conservation
2019-02-08HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2019-02-07Senateto House
2019-02-07SenateTitle apvd
2019-02-07SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0
2019-02-06SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-02-05SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-02-01SenateReported Printed; referred to Resources & Environment
2019-01-31SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback