ID S1040 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-03 - Signed by Governor on 04/03/15 Session Law Chapter 245 Effective: 04/03/2015 and shall apply to any case where an appellant's brief in the unified appeal has not been filed with the Idaho Supreme Court
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-03 - Signed by Governor on 04/03/15 Session Law Chapter 245 Effective: 04/03/2015 and shall apply to any case where an appellant's brief in the unified appeal has not been filed with the Idaho Supreme Court
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
CRIMINAL PROCEDURE - Amends existing law to clarify language regarding filing of certain appeals when punishment of death has been imposed.
Title
Amends existing law to clarify language regarding filing of certain appeals when punishment of death has been imposed.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-03 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 04/03/15 Session Law Chapter 245 Effective: 04/03/2015 and shall apply to any case where an appellant's brief in the unified appeal has not been filed with the Idaho Supreme Court |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Reported delivered to Governor on 03/30/15 |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2015-03-27 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2015-03-24 | House | to Senate |
2015-03-24 | House | Title apvd |
2015-03-24 | House | PASSED -- 69-0-1 |
2015-03-24 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2015-03-23 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2015-03-20 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 23, 2015 |
2015-03-19 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2015-03-18 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules, & Administration |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2015-03-09 | Senate | to House |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Title apvd |
2015-03-09 | Senate | PASSED -- 35-0-0 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Read third time in full as amended |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Read second time as amended, filed for Third reading |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Read first time as amended, filed for Second Reading |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Reported out without recommendation, as amended |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Referred to 14th Order for amendment |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Judiciary & Rules |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |