ID S1037 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Session Law Chapter 149 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

ENGINEERS AND LAND SURVEYORS -- Amends existing law to clarify that private land surveyors may access private land.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to clarify that private land surveyors may access private land.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21SenateSession Law Chapter 149 Effective: 07/01/2019
2019-03-20SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2019-03-19HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2019-03-18SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2019-03-15SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2019-03-14Houseto Senate
2019-03-14HouseTitle apvd
2019-03-14HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 45-19-6
2019-03-13HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-12HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-03-05HouseRead First Time, Referred to Business
2019-03-05HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2019-03-04Senateto House
2019-03-04SenateTitle apvd
2019-03-04SenateRead third time in full as amended -- PASSED 28-7-0
2019-03-01SenateRead second time as amended, filed for Third reading
2019-02-28SenateRead first time as amended, filed for Second Reading
2019-02-28SenateReported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended
2019-02-28SenateAmendments reported printed
2019-02-28SenateAmendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment
2019-02-28SenateReported out without recommendation, as amended
2019-02-28SenatePlaced in the Committee of the Whole
2019-02-13SenateReported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment
2019-01-31SenateReported Printed; referred to Commerce & Human Resources
2019-01-30SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback