ID S1033 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-12 - Read First Time, Referred to Health & Welfare
Pending: House Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

ORGAN DONORS -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding notification in the event of a donor's death.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding notification in the event of a donor's death.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-12HouseRead First Time, Referred to Health & Welfare
2019-02-12HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2019-02-11Senateto House
2019-02-11SenateTitle apvd
2019-02-11SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 33-0-2
2019-02-06SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-02-05SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-01-30SenateReported Printed; referred to Health & Welfare
2019-01-29SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback