ID S1033 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - Returned from House Failed; to Secretary of Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - Returned from House Failed; to Secretary of Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
CRIMINAL HISTORY RECORDS - Amends existing law to provide for the retention and expungement of fingerprint records in certain instances.
Title
Amends existing law to provide for the retention and expungement of fingerprint records in certain instances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-31 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-03-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | Senate | Returned from House Failed; to Secretary of Senate |
2015-03-31 | House | Ret'd to Senate |
2015-03-31 | House | FAILED -- 32-37-1 |
2015-03-31 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2015-03-30 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2015-03-27 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 30, 2015 |
2015-03-26 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2015-03-25 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2015-03-24 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2015-03-20 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules, & Administration |
2015-03-20 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2015-03-19 | Senate | to House |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Title apvd |
2015-03-19 | Senate | PASSED -- 23-11-1 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Read third time in full as amended |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Read second time as amended, filed for Third reading |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Read first time as amended, filed for Second Reading |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Reported out without recommendation, as amended |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Judiciary & Rules |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |