ID S1028 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Session Law Chapter 68 Effective: 07/01/2019; 07/01/2023 Sunset Clause
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

WORKER'S COMPENSATION -- Amends existing law to make psychological injuries suffered by first responders compensable.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to make psychological injuries suffered by first responders compensable.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12SenateSession Law Chapter 68 Effective: 07/01/2019; 07/01/2023 Sunset Clause
2019-03-06SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2019-03-04SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2019-03-01SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2019-02-28Houseto Senate
2019-02-28HouseTitle apvd
2019-02-28HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 59-10-1
2019-02-27HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-02-26HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-02-25HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-02-22HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-02-13HouseRead First Time, Referred to Commerce & Human Resources
2019-02-13HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2019-02-12Senateto House
2019-02-12SenateTitle apvd
2019-02-12SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 31-4-0
2019-02-11SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-02-08SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-01-28SenateReported Printed; referred to Commerce & Human Resources
2019-01-25SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback