ID S1028 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-28 - Session Law Chapter 40 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-28 - Session Law Chapter 40 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
UNDERGROUND STORAGE TANK ACT -- Adds to existing law to provide for the Idaho Underground Storage Tank Program Fund.
Title
Adds to existing law to provide for the Idaho Underground Storage Tank Program Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 40 Effective: 07/01/2017 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2017-02-22 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2017-02-17 | House | to Senate |
2017-02-17 | House | Title apvd |
2017-02-17 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 65-0-5 |
2017-02-16 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-02-15 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2017-02-07 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Environment, Energy & Technology |
2017-02-07 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2017-02-06 | Senate | to House |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 33-0-2 |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Resources & Environment |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |