ID S1025 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-11 - Session Law Chapter 11 Effective: 02/11/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

APPROPRIATIONS -- STEM ACTION CENTER -- Relates to the appropriation to the STEM Action Center for fiscal year 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the appropriation to the STEM Action Center for fiscal year 2019.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-11SenateSession Law Chapter 11 Effective: 02/11/2019
2019-02-08SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2019-02-07HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2019-02-06SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2019-02-05SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2019-02-04Houseto Senate
2019-02-04HouseTitle apvd
2019-02-04HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 68-0-2
2019-02-01HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 4, 2019
2019-01-31HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-01-30HouseRead First Time, Filed for Second Reading
2019-01-30HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2019-01-29Senateto House
2019-01-29SenateTitle apvd
2019-01-29SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0
2019-01-28SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-01-25SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-01-24SenateReported Printed; referred to Finance
2019-01-23SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback