ID S1024 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Session Law Chapter 32 Effective: 02/26/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

CROP RESIDUE BURNING -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding payment of a fee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding payment of a fee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26SenateSession Law Chapter 32 Effective: 02/26/2019
2019-02-22SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2019-02-21HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2019-02-20SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2019-02-19SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2019-02-18Houseto Senate
2019-02-18HouseTitle apvd
2019-02-18HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 69-0-1
2019-02-15HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-02-14HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-02-07HouseRead First Time, Referred to Agricultural Affairs
2019-02-07HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2019-02-06Senateto House
2019-02-06SenateTitle apvd
2019-02-06SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0
2019-02-01SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-01-31SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-01-24SenateReported Printed; referred to Agricultural Affairs
2019-01-23SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback