ID S1018 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Session Law Chapter 59 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

EDUCATION -- Repeals existing law relating to school accountability report cards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeals existing law relating to school accountability report cards.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-16SenateSession Law Chapter 59 Effective: 07/01/2017
2017-03-13SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2017-03-10HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2017-03-09SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2017-03-09SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2017-03-08Houseto Senate
2017-03-08HouseTitle apvd
2017-03-08HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 70-0-0
2017-03-07HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2017-03-06HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2017-03-03HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 6, 2017
2017-03-02HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2017-03-01HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2017-02-28HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2017-02-27HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2017-02-24HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2017-02-09HouseRead First Time, Referred to Education
2017-02-09HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2017-02-08Senateto House
2017-02-08SenateTitle apvd
2017-02-08SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1
2017-02-07SenateRetained on calendar
2017-02-06SenateRetained on calendar
2017-02-02SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2017-02-01SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2017-01-23SenateReported Printed; referred to Education
2017-01-20SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback