ID S1015 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Session Law Chapter 147 Effective: 07/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

EXTENDED LEARNING OPPORTUNITIES -- Amends existing law to limit applicability to full-time students.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to limit applicability to full-time students.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-27SenateSession Law Chapter 147 Effective: 07/01/2023
2023-03-23SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2023-03-23HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2023-03-22SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2023-03-22SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2023-03-21Houseto Senate
2023-03-21HouseTitle apvd
2023-03-21HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 46-23-1
2023-03-20HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2023-03-17HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2023-03-16HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2023-03-03HouseRead First Time, Referred to Education
2023-03-03HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2023-03-02Senateto House
2023-03-02SenateTitle apvd
2023-03-02SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 29-6-0
2023-02-22SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2023-02-21SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2023-01-23SenateReported Printed; referred to Education
2023-01-20SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback