ID S1015 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-17 - Signed by Governor on 03/17/15 Session Law Chapter 53 Effective: 07/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-17 - Signed by Governor on 03/17/15 Session Law Chapter 53 Effective: 07/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
MOTOR VEHICLE DEALERS - Amends existing law to remove bond provisions relating to certain dealers, to require the procurement and filing of a specified bond by wholesale dealers, to provide an exemption from participation in the Idaho Consumer Asset Recovery Fund by certain wholesale dealer licensees and to specify bond requirements for all other dealers.
Title
Amends existing law to remove bond provisions relating to certain dealers, to require the procurement and filing of a specified bond by wholesale dealers, to provide an exemption from participation in the Idaho Consumer Asset Recovery Fund by certain wholesale dealer licensees and to specify bond requirements for all other dealers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 03/17/15 Session Law Chapter 53 Effective: 07/01/2015 |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Reported delivered to Governor on 03/12/15 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2015-03-11 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2015-03-06 | House | to Senate |
2015-03-06 | House | Title apvd |
2015-03-06 | House | PASSED -- 64-0-6 |
2015-03-06 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2015-03-05 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2015-03-04 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2015-03-03 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2015-02-25 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Transportation & Defense |
2015-02-25 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2015-02-24 | Senate | to House |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Title apvd |
2015-02-24 | Senate | PASSED -- 34-0-0 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Read third time in full as amended |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Read second time as amended, filed for Third reading |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Read first time as amended, filed for Second Reading |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Reported out without recommendation, as amended |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Referred to 14th Order for amendment |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Transportation |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |