ID S1012 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

BUILDING SAFETY -- Amends existing law to reduce the mandatory number of board meetings and to change the quorum requirement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to reduce the mandatory number of board meetings and to change the quorum requirement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-15SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2019-03-14Houseto Senate
2019-03-14HouseTitle apvd
2019-03-14HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 68-0-2
2019-03-13HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-12HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-11HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-08HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 11, 2019
2019-03-07HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-06HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-04HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-04HouseU.C. to place at bottom of third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-01HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-02-28HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-02-22HouseRead First Time, Referred to Business
2019-02-22HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2019-02-21Senateto House
2019-02-21SenateTitle apvd
2019-02-21SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1
2019-02-18SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-02-15SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-01-21SenateReported Printed; referred to Commerce & Human Resources
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback