ID S1011 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

UNDERGROUND FACILITIES DAMAGE PREVENTION -- Amends existing law to define terms, to revise provisions regarding locating and marking underground facilities, to revise provisions regarding compensation for failure to comply, and to revise a provision regarding the duties of underground facility owners and excavators.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to define terms, to revise provisions regarding locating and marking underground facilities, to revise provisions regarding compensation for failure to comply, and to revise a provision regarding the duties of underground facility owners and excavators.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2019-03-20HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2019-03-19SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2019-03-19SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2019-03-18Houseto Senate
2019-03-18HouseTitle apvd
2019-03-18HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 67-0-3
2019-03-15HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 18, 2019
2019-03-14HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-13HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-02-27HouseRead First Time, Referred to Environment, Energy & Technology
2019-02-27HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2019-02-26Senateto House
2019-02-26SenateTitle apvd
2019-02-26SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1
2019-02-21SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-02-20SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-01-21SenateReported Printed; referred to Commerce & Human Resources
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback