ID S1011 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-25 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 17 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-25 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 17 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to the rules of the road to clarify driver duties upon approaching a stationary police vehicle or an authorized emergency vehicle displaying flashing lights.
Title
Amends existing law relating to the rules of the road to clarify driver duties upon approaching a stationary police vehicle or an authorized emergency vehicle displaying flashing lights.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-02-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-25 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 17 Effective: 07/01/11 | |
2011-02-25 | Delivered to Governor on 02/24 | |
2011-02-24 | To Governor | |
2011-02-23 | Sp signed | |
2011-02-22 | Pres signed | |
2011-02-22 | Rpt enrol | |
2011-02-21 | To enrol | |
2011-02-18 | to Senate | |
2011-02-18 | Title apvd | |
2011-02-18 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 62-0-8 | |
2011-02-16 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-02-16 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-15 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-15 | rec d/p | |
2011-02-15 | Rpt out | |
2011-02-09 | to Transp | |
2011-02-09 | 1st rdg | |
2011-02-09 | House intro | |
2011-02-08 | to House | |
2011-02-08 | Title apvd | |
2011-02-08 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 35-0-0 | |
2011-02-04 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-02-04 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-03 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-03 | rec d/p | |
2011-02-03 | Rpt out | |
2011-01-19 | to Jud | |
2011-01-19 | Rpt prt | |
2011-01-18 | to printing | |
2011-01-18 | 1st rdg | |
2011-01-18 | Senate intro |