ID S1009 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-26 - Signed by Governor on 02/26/13 Session Law Chapter 24 Effective: 07/01/13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-26 - Signed by Governor on 02/26/13 Session Law Chapter 24 Effective: 07/01/13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law to revise the deadline for the submittal of appeals to the Board of Tax Appeals from the County Board of Equalization.
Title
Amends existing law to revise the deadline for the submittal of appeals to the Board of Tax Appeals from the County Board of Equalization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-26 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 02/26/13 Session Law Chapter 24 Effective: 07/01/13 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Reported delivered to Governor on 02/21/13 |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2013-02-20 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2013-02-18 | House | to Senate |
2013-02-18 | House | Title apvd |
2013-02-18 | House | PASSED -- 69-0-1 |
2013-02-18 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2013-02-15 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 18, 2013 |
2013-02-14 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2013-02-13 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2013-02-12 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2013-02-11 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2013-01-30 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Revenue & Taxation |
2013-01-30 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2013-01-29 | Senate | to House |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Title apvd |
2013-01-29 | Senate | PASSED -- 35-0-0 |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Local Government & Taxation |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |