ID S1009 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-03 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 26 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-03 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 26 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to the commencement of actions to revise provisions relating to service upon certain persons outside of this state.
Title
Amends existing law relating to the commencement of actions to revise provisions relating to service upon certain persons outside of this state.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-02-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-03 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 26 Effective: 07/01/11 | |
2011-02-28 | Delivered to Governor on 02/25 | |
2011-02-25 | To Governor | |
2011-02-24 | Sp signed | |
2011-02-23 | Pres signed | |
2011-02-23 | Rpt enrol | |
2011-02-22 | To enrol | |
2011-02-21 | to Senate | |
2011-02-21 | Title apvd | |
2011-02-21 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 68-0-2 | |
2011-02-17 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-02-17 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-16 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-16 | rec d/p | |
2011-02-16 | Rpt out | |
2011-02-09 | to Jud | |
2011-02-09 | 1st rdg | |
2011-02-09 | House intro | |
2011-02-08 | to House | |
2011-02-08 | Title apvd | |
2011-02-08 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 35-0-0 | |
2011-02-04 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-02-04 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-03 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-03 | rec d/p | |
2011-02-03 | Rpt out | |
2011-01-19 | to Jud | |
2011-01-19 | Rpt prt | |
2011-01-18 | to printing | |
2011-01-18 | 1st rdg | |
2011-01-18 | Senate intro |