ID S1008 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-09 - Session Law Chapter 1 Effective: 02/09/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

APPROPRIATIONS -- OFFICE OF THE STATE BOARD OF EDUCATION -- Relates to the appropriation to the Office of the State Board of Education for fiscal year 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the appropriation to the Office of the State Board of Education for fiscal year 2021.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-09SenateSession Law Chapter 1 Effective: 02/09/2021
2021-02-04SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2021-02-03HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2021-02-02SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2021-02-01SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2021-01-29Houseto Senate
2021-01-29HouseTitle apvd
2021-01-29HousePreviously Read in Full -- PASSED 64-3-3
2021-01-29HouseRead Third Time in Full
2021-01-28HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2021-01-27HouseRead First Time, Filed for Second Reading
2021-01-27HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2021-01-26Senateto House
2021-01-26SenateTitle apvd
2021-01-26SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0
2021-01-25SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2021-01-22SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2021-01-20SenateReported Printed; referred to Finance
2021-01-19SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback