ID S1008 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Session Law Chapter 66 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

ELECTRICAL CONTRACTORS AND JOURNEYMEN -- Amends existing law to change the length of apprentice registrations, to establish requirements for in-state and out-of-state applicants to take the electrical journeyman's exam, to require filing of and online access to employment verification forms, and to allow the administrator of the division to revive expired apprentice and limited electrical installer trainee registrations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to change the length of apprentice registrations, to establish requirements for in-state and out-of-state applicants to take the electrical journeyman's exam, to require filing of and online access to employment verification forms, and to allow the administrator of the division to revive expired apprentice and limited electrical installer trainee registrations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11SenateSession Law Chapter 66 Effective: 07/01/2019
2019-03-11SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2019-03-08HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2019-03-07SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2019-03-06SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2019-03-05Houseto Senate
2019-03-05HouseTitle apvd
2019-03-05HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 67-2-1
2019-03-04HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-04HouseU.C. to place at bottom of third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-01HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-02-28HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-02-13HouseRead First Time, Referred to Business
2019-02-13HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2019-02-12Senateto House
2019-02-12SenateTitle apvd
2019-02-12SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0
2019-02-11SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-02-08SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-01-21SenateReported Printed; referred to Commerce & Human Resources
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback