ID S1008 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Session Law Chapter 66 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Session Law Chapter 66 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
ELECTRICAL CONTRACTORS AND JOURNEYMEN -- Amends existing law to change the length of apprentice registrations, to establish requirements for in-state and out-of-state applicants to take the electrical journeyman's exam, to require filing of and online access to employment verification forms, and to allow the administrator of the division to revive expired apprentice and limited electrical installer trainee registrations.
Title
Amends existing law to change the length of apprentice registrations, to establish requirements for in-state and out-of-state applicants to take the electrical journeyman's exam, to require filing of and online access to employment verification forms, and to allow the administrator of the division to revive expired apprentice and limited electrical installer trainee registrations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 66 Effective: 07/01/2019 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2019-03-08 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2019-03-05 | House | to Senate |
2019-03-05 | House | Title apvd |
2019-03-05 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 67-2-1 |
2019-03-04 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2019-03-04 | House | U.C. to place at bottom of third reading calendar one legislative day |
2019-03-01 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2019-02-28 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2019-02-13 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Business |
2019-02-13 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2019-02-12 | Senate | to House |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Title apvd |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Commerce & Human Resources |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |