ID S1005 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

WATER DISTRICTS -- Amends existing law to authorize water districts to charge fees to certain water delivery organizations and water users.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to authorize water districts to charge fees to certain water delivery organizations and water users.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-02HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2021-02-12HouseRead First Time, Referred to Resources & Conservation
2021-02-12HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2021-02-11Senateto House
2021-02-11SenateTitle apvd
2021-02-11SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1
2021-02-05SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2021-02-04SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2021-01-20SenateReported Printed; referred to Resources & Environment
2021-01-19SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback