ID S1005 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Session Law Chapter 143 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

HUMAN TRAFFICKING -- Amends and repeals existing law to revise legislative intent, to revise the definition of “human trafficking,” to define terms, and to revise the penalty for human trafficking.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends and repeals existing law to revise legislative intent, to revise the definition of “human trafficking,” to define terms, and to revise the penalty for human trafficking.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21SenateSession Law Chapter 143 Effective: 07/01/2019
2019-03-20SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2019-03-19HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2019-03-18SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2019-03-18SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2019-03-15Houseto Senate
2019-03-15HouseTitle apvd
2019-03-15HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 67-0-3
2019-03-14HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-14HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-13HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-12HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-11HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-08HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-02-22HouseRead First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration
2019-02-22HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2019-02-21Senateto House
2019-02-21SenateTitle apvd
2019-02-21SenateRead third time in full as amended -- PASSED 34-0-1
2019-02-15SenateRead second time as amended, filed for Third reading
2019-02-14SenateRead first time as amended, filed for Second Reading
2019-02-14SenateReported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended
2019-02-14SenateAmendments reported printed
2019-02-13SenateAmendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment
2019-02-13SenateReported out without recommendation, as amended
2019-02-13SenatePlaced in the Committee of the Whole
2019-02-04SenateReferred to 14th Order for amendment
2019-01-28SenateRetained on calendar
2019-01-25SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-01-24SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-01-18SenateReported Printed; referred to Judiciary & Rules
2019-01-17SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback