ID S1004 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-11 - Session Law Chapter 3 Effective: 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

TWENTY-SEVENTH PAYROLL FUND -- Adds to existing law to establish the Twenty-seventh Payroll Fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to existing law to establish the Twenty-seventh Payroll Fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-11SenateSession Law Chapter 3 Effective: 07/01/2021
2021-02-10SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2021-02-09HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2021-02-08SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2021-02-05SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2021-02-04Houseto Senate
2021-02-04HouseTitle apvd
2021-02-04HousePreviously Read in Full -- PASSED 69-0-1
2021-02-04HouseRead Third Time in Full
2021-02-03HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2021-02-02HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2021-01-27HouseRead First Time, Referred to Commerce & Human Resources
2021-01-27HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2021-01-26Senateto House
2021-01-26SenateTitle apvd
2021-01-26SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0
2021-01-25SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2021-01-22SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2021-01-19SenateReported Printed; referred to State Affairs
2021-01-18SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback