ID S1003 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-11 - Signed by Governor on 02/11/15 Session Law Chapter 3 Effective: 02/11/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

APPROPRIATIONS - DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY - Appropriates an additional $500,000 to the Department of Environmental Quality for fiscal year 2015 for environmental cleanup and monitoring.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriates an additional $500,000 to the Department of Environmental Quality for fiscal year 2015 for environmental cleanup and monitoring.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-11SenateSigned by Governor on 02/11/15 Session Law Chapter 3 Effective: 02/11/2015
2015-02-10SenateReported delivered to Governor on 02/09/15
2015-02-09SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2015-02-06HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2015-02-05SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2015-02-04SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2015-02-03Houseto Senate
2015-02-03HouseTitle apvd
2015-02-03HousePASSED -- 56-13-1
2015-02-03HouseRead Third Time in Full
2015-02-02HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2015-01-30HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2015-01-29HouseRead First Time, Filed for Second Reading
2015-01-29HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2015-01-28Senateto House
2015-01-28SenateTitle apvd
2015-01-28SenatePASSED -- 34-0-1
2015-01-28SenateRead third time in full
2015-01-27SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2015-01-26SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2015-01-23SenateReported Printed; referred to Finance
2015-01-22SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback