ID S1003 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Signed by Governor on 03/13/13 Session Law Chapter 70 Effective: 07/01/13
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amends existing law relating to fish and game to revise provisions relating to class 2 and class 6 licenses; to remove provisions relating to youth small game licenses and youth hunter education graduate licenses; to provide that a trapping license shall entitle the purchaser to trap wolves; to revise provisions relating to certain nonresident licenses; and to revise fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law relating to fish and game to revise provisions relating to class 2 and class 6 licenses; to remove provisions relating to youth small game licenses and youth hunter education graduate licenses; to provide that a trapping license shall entitle the purchaser to trap wolves; to revise provisions relating to certain nonresident licenses; and to revise fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-13SenateSigned by Governor on 03/13/13 Session Law Chapter 70 Effective: 07/01/13
2013-03-12SenateReported delivered to Governor on 03/12/13
2013-03-12SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2013-03-11HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2013-03-08SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2013-03-07SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2013-03-06Houseto Senate
2013-03-06HouseTitle apvd
2013-03-06HousePASSED -- 67-0-3
2013-03-06HouseRead Third Time in Full
2013-03-05HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2013-03-04HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2013-03-01HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 4, 2013
2013-02-28HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2013-02-27HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2013-02-26HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2013-02-20HouseRead First Time, Referred to Resources & Conservation
2013-02-20HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2013-02-19Senateto House
2013-02-19SenateTitle apvd
2013-02-19SenatePASSED -- 30-4-1
2013-02-19SenateRead third time in full as amended
2013-02-18SenateRead second time as amended, filed for Third reading
2013-02-15SenateRead first time as amended, filed for Second Reading
2013-02-15SenateReported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended
2013-02-15SenateAmendments reported printed
2013-02-14SenateAmendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment
2013-02-14SenateReported out without recommendation, as amended
2013-02-14SenatePlaced in the Committee of the Whole
2013-02-01SenateReferred to 14th Order for amendment
2013-01-31SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2013-01-16SenateReported Printed; referred to Resources & Environment
2013-01-15SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback