ID S1002 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-04 - Session Law Chapter 1 Effective: 02/04/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

APPROPRIATIONS -- INDUSTRIAL COMMISSION -- Relates to the appropriation to the Industrial Commission for fiscal year 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the appropriation to the Industrial Commission for fiscal year 2019.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-04SenateSession Law Chapter 1 Effective: 02/04/2019
2019-02-01SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
2019-01-31HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2019-01-30SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2019-01-29SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2019-01-28Houseto Senate
2019-01-28HouseTitle apvd
2019-01-28HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 63-7-0
2019-01-25HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, January 28, 2019
2019-01-24HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-01-23HouseRead First Time, Filed for Second Reading
2019-01-23HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2019-01-22Senateto House
2019-01-22SenateTitle apvd
2019-01-22SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0
2019-01-21SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-01-18SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-01-17SenateReported Printed; referred to Finance
2019-01-16SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback